EP4262277 - MOBILITY ENHANCEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hongsuk Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Sunghoon Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Myoungsoo Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22197198.9 | 22.09.2022 | [2023/42] | Priority number, date | US202263331221P | 14.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263331221 P | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262277 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W36/36, // H04W36/08 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H04W36/00838 (EP);
H04W36/165 (KR);
H04W36/32 (US);
H04W36/0016 (US);
H04W36/0061 (KR);
H04W36/0083 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILITÄTSVERBESSERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/42] | English: | MOBILITY ENHANCEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/42] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE LA MOBILITÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020117118 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15* page 42, line 10 - page 47, line 16; figures 7A, 7B, 8A, 8B *; | [X]EP3780742 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] *; | [XI]WO2021090626 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10,12-14 * paragraph [0236] - paragraph [0258]; figures 53-59 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0067]; figures 6-10 * [I] 5-8,11,15; | [A]US2022078684 (FEHRENBACH THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0240]; figures 3-9 *; | [A] - APPLE, "Consecutive Conditiona Handover", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190816), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1909862_CONSECUTIVE CONDITIONAL HANDOVER_V0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107/Docs/R2-1909862.zip, (20190816), XP051767653 [A] 1-15 * Whole clause 2.2 * |