EP4159132 - MAMMOGRAPHY SYSTEM WITH PROTECTION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Limmer, Andreas 90768 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Nanke, Ralf 91077 Neunkirchen am Brand / DE | 03 /
Radicke, Marcus 90587 Veitsbronn / DE | 04 /
Ritter, Juliane 91096 Möhrendorf / DE | 05 /
Weidner, Tom 91056 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
Eller, Lukas 91301 Forchheim / DE | 07 /
Göttler, Stephanie 92348 Berg / DE | 08 /
Speitel, Jutta 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22197199.7 | 22.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | EP20210200287 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21200287 | [2023/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159132 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/02, A61B6/10, // A61B6/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61B6/025 (EP);
A61B6/102 (EP);
A61B6/502 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAMMOGRAPHIESYSTEM MIT SCHUTZEINHEIT | [2023/14] | English: | MAMMOGRAPHY SYSTEM WITH PROTECTION UNIT | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MAMMOGRAPHIE COMPRENANT UNE UNITÉ DE PROTECTION | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE102006007833 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [ID] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4, 5 *; | [I]WO2009047054 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 26; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2679157 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0079]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2020069031 (HOLOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0064] * | by applicant | DE102006007833 |