Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023122911 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023637 | 11.09.2013 | US201615018078 | 08.02.2016 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | US201916371618 | 01.04.2019 | US202217985220 | 11.11.2022 | US201414481986 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020060976 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023637 | 11.09.2013 | US201615018078 | 08.02.2016 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | US201916371618 | 01.04.2019 | US201414481986 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019209476 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615267352 | 16.09.2016 | US201816044255 | 24.07.2018 | US201314023878 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017224624 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615267352 | 16.09.2016 | US201314023878 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017027910 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023637 | 11.09.2013 | US201615018078 | 08.02.2016 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | US201414481986 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014378517 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023637 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | US201414481986 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014179749 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023878 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014100256 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314023637 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11839689 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2023 | B2 | US2023210778 | 06.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615267352 | 16.09.2016 | US202217985235 | 11.11.2022 | US201816044255 | 24.07.2018 | US202117178580 | 18.02.2021 | US201916693655 | 25.11.2019 | US201314023878 | 11.09.2013 | US202117487546 | 28.09.2021 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | US202016924656 | 09.07.2020 | US202217662278 | 06.05.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102225416B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B1 | KR20150082203 | 15.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021178871 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019146714 | 08.08.2019 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6932746B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2021 | B2 | JP2019194262 | 07.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018011759 | 26.01.2018 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6404217B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B2 | JP2015527411 | 17.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL237604 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4324527 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2024 | A3 | EP4324527 | 21.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | EP22197255 | 11.09.2013 | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | EP21190086 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3971167 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3725778 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | B1 | EP3725778 | 21.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2895463 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109897004 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380055471 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105358535B | Global Dossier | 04.01.2019 | B | CN105358535 | 24.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2884795 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2023 | C | CA2884795 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018200316 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | AU2013315619 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | AU2018200316 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013315619B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | B2 | AU2013315619 | 30.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4169908 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | EP21190086 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015005432 | 18.04.2023 | B1 | BR112015005432 | 05.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1124729T | 22.07.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3725778T | 20.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA033374 | 18.12.2019 | B9 | EA033374 | 31.10.2019 | B1 | EA201500314 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1212701 | 17.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20211423T | 21.01.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2875DELNP2015 | 11.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX363974 | 10.04.2019 | B | MX2015003140 | 16.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015500525 | 04.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3725778T | 20.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | EP13766437 | 11.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS62676 | 31.12.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3725778T | 28.02.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20177837 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA117353 | 25.07.2018 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201501847 | 27.01.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2013US59223 | 11.09.2013 | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014043208 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018087206 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016204392 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201991484 | 29.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2892029T | 01.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE057701T | 28.05.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3725778T | 27.12.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019003984 | 12.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021000007 | 09.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3725778T | 22.09.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI673051B | 01.10.2019 | B | TW201427659 | 16.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261699351 | 11.09.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP4324527 | Type | Earlier application | EP2895463 | EP3725778 | EP3971167 |