EP4169908 - FORMULATIONS OF ENZALUTAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivation Prostate Therapeutics LLC 66 Hudson Boulevard East New York, NY 10001-2192 / US | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 2-5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2023/31] |
Former [2023/17] | For all designated states Medivation Prostate Therapeutics LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | ||
For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 2-5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZ, Douglas Alan Bend, 97701 / US | 02 /
KONAGURTHU, Sanjay Bend, 97701 / US | 03 /
WALD, Randy J. Bend, 97701 / US | 04 /
EVERETT, Jason A. Bend, 97701 / US | 05 /
MATZ, Sheila New York, 10017 / US | 06 /
TAKAISHI, Yuuki Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 07 /
SAKAI, Toshiro Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 08 /
IRIE, Ryousuke Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 09 /
OBA, Shinsuke Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 10 /
TOYOTA, Hiroyasu Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 11 /
NISHIMURA, Koji Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | 12 /
KANBAYASHI, Atsushi Tokyo, 103-8411 / JP | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Justin Scott Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22197255.7 | 11.09.2013 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US201261699351P | 11.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261699351 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169908 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/86, A61K31/4166, A61P35/00, A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61K9/16, A61P13/08, A61P15/00, A61P15/08, A61P15/14, A61P43/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/1635 (EP,IL);
A61K31/4164 (EA,IL,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/32 (IL,US);
A61K47/38 (IL,US);
A61K9/10 (IL,US);
A61K9/146 (EP);
A61K9/16 (IL,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2095 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/08 (EP,IL);
A61P15/14 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07D233/86 (EP,EA,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENZALUTAMIDFORMULIERUNGEN | [2023/17] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF ENZALUTAMIDE | [2023/17] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'ENZALUTAMIDE | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13766437.1 / EP2895463 | EP20177837.0 / EP3725778 | EP21190086.5 / EP3971167 | Divisional application(s) | EP23205739.8 / EP4324527 | EP24198653.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03063821 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007004753 (SAWYERS CHARLES L [US], et al); | by applicant | US2002009494 | US2002031547 | US7709517 |