EP4169539 - SILK-HYALURONIC ACID BASED TISSUE FILLERS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evolved by Nature, Inc. 196 Boston Avenue Medford, MA 02155 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMAN, Gregory H. Providence, RI, 02906 / US | 02 /
XU, Peng Lexington, MA, 02421 / US | 03 /
JIN, Erlei Peabody, MA, 01960 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22197284.7 | 26.06.2018 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US201762525131P | 26.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762525131 P | US201862641095P | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862641095 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169539 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/20, A61L27/50, A61L27/52, A61L27/22, A61L27/26 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61L27/52 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L27/54 (KR);
C08L5/08 (IL,KR);
C08L89/00 (IL);
A61L2300/402 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L2400/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L2430/34 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (EP);
A61L27/227, C08L89/00 (EP);
A61L27/26, C08L5/08, C08L89/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBEFÜLLSTOFFE AUF BASIS VON SEIDENHYALURONSÄURE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/17] | English: | SILK-HYALURONIC ACID BASED TISSUE FILLERS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2023/17] | French: | CHARGES DE TISSU À BASE DE SOIE-ACIDE HYALURONIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 26.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18823073.4 / EP3645063 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN102836465 ; | [XI]US2011189292 (LEBRETON PIERRE F [FR], et al); | [A]WO2013040242 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2014055895 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [AD]US2015094269 (ALTMAN GREGORY H [US], et al); | [A]US2017136145 (LIU FUTIAN [US], et al); | [XP]WO2018039496 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | by applicant | US4355023 | US4657853 | US4676980 | US4925921 | US4970156 | US2006105022 | US8288347 | US8450475 | US2015093340 | US2015094269 | US9187538 | US2016022560 | US2016022561 | US2016022562 | US2016022563 | US2016193130 | US2016222579 | US2016281294 | US9511012 | US9517191 | US9522107 | US9522108 | US2016376382 | US9545369 | US2017315828 |