EP4258172 - MANAGING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING AGENTS USING MULTI-CRITERIA GROUP CONSENSUS IN A LOCALIZED MICROGRID CLUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Solutions Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Debashish Corvina, 91724 / US | 02 /
KING, Cory Calgary, T3H 5M4 / CA | 03 /
SHAFFER, Brent San Diego, 92103 / US | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Strange, Harry George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London, Greater London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22197605.3 | 26.09.2022 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | US202217713376 | 05.04.2022 Original published format: US202217713376 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258172 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/045, G06N3/092, G06N5/043 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06N3/092 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N5/043 (EP);
H02J3/003 (US);
H02J3/32 (US);
H02J2203/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON VERSTÄRKUNGSLERNAGENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MULTIKRITERIENGRUPPENKONSENSUS IN EINEM LOKALISIERTEN MIKROGITTERCLUSTER | [2023/41] | English: | MANAGING REINFORCEMENT LEARNING AGENTS USING MULTI-CRITERIA GROUP CONSENSUS IN A LOCALIZED MICROGRID CLUSTER | [2023/41] | French: | GESTION D'AGENTS D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR RENFORCEMENT À L'AIDE D'UN CONSENSUS DE GROUPE MULTICRITÈRES DANS UN GROUPE DE MICRORÉSEAUX LOCALISÉS | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 11.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ZHANG QIANZHI ET AL, "Multi-Agent Safe Policy Learning for Power Management of Networked Microgrids", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SMART GRID, USA, vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TSG.2020.3034827, ISSN 1949-3053, (20210226), pages 1048 - 1062, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=9244070&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9zY2hvbGFyLmdvb2dsZS5jb20v, (20230504), XP093044255 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSG.2020.3034827 |