EP4163341 - AQUEOUS INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INK JET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Yoshiyuki Tokyo / JP | 02 /
SANADA, Mikio Tokyo / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Yoshihisa Tokyo / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Junichi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
YAMAKAMI, Hideki Tokyo / JP | 06 /
TAKEDA, Shoichi Tokyo / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 22197648.3 | 26.09.2022 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | JP20210165007 | 06.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021165007 | JP20220145603 | 13.09.2022 Original published format: JP 2022145603 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163341 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/322, C09D11/107, C09D11/38, C09D11/102 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/033 (US);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D11/107 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE TINTE, TINTENPATRONE UND TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/15] | English: | AQUEOUS INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INK JET RECORDING METHOD | [2023/15] | French: | ENCRE AQUEUSE, CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3360682 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; examples 1,2 *; | [A]US2019231662 (LINGOES JANETTE VILLALOBOS [US], et al) [A] 1-20* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2021123127 (KRONOS INT INC [DE]) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | JP2019044069 |