EP4174925 - CAPACITOR WITH AN ELECTRODE WELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin TX 78735 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhu, Ronghua 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LIN, Xin 5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ROGGENBAUER, Todd 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22197786.1 | 26.09.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US202117452695 | 28.10.2021 Original published format: US202117452695 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174925 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8234, H01L21/8238, H01L27/06, H01L29/66, H01L29/94 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H01L27/0629 (EP,CN);
H01L23/642 (CN);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L21/76286 (EP);
H01L23/5223 (CN);
H01L27/105 (US);
H01L28/40 (CN);
H01L28/60 (CN);
H01L29/66181 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDENSATOR MIT ELEKTRODENMULDE | [2023/18] | English: | CAPACITOR WITH AN ELECTRODE WELL | [2023/18] | French: | CONDENSATEUR AVEC UN PUITS D'ÉLECTRODE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013009272 (SAKURAI SHINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 2A *[I] 7; | [XI]US2018315864 (LI XIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,15 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * figure 3 * [I] 2,6-8 |