Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4344654 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4344654



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(21)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 68
03.10.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.10.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
03.10.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
03.10.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.10.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
03.10.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.10.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.04.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.03.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.03.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 3
15.03.2023 European search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
06.03.2023 Search started Search / examination 1
27.09.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2022 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2022 Description Search / examination 18
27.09.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2022 Drawings Search / examination 4
27.09.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5