EP4345786 - SMOKE DETECTOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SMOKE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atral-Secal GmbH Zum Gunterstal 66440 Blieskastel / DE | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAAF, Norbert Karl 65343 Eltville / DE | 02 /
VIERTEL, Tobias 65527 Niederseelbach / DE | 03 /
KROH, Christoph 65510 Idstein / DE | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 22198379.4 | 28.09.2022 | [2024/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4345786 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/10, G08B29/18 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G08B17/10 (EP);
G08B29/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHMELDER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES RAUCHMELDERS | [2024/14] | English: | SMOKE DETECTOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SMOKE DETECTOR | [2024/14] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉE | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102012217359 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [XA]EP3147879 (TYCO FIRE & SECURITY GMBH [CH]); | [X]US2021158679 (ESCOFET VIA JORDI [ES], et al); | [X]EP4006858 (CARRIER CORP [US]) |