EP4160197 - THERMOGRAPHIC INSPECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Koji Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Yuta Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Hirayama, Rie Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22198497.4 | 28.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | JP20210162288 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021162288 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160197 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/72 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G01N25/72 (EP,US);
G01N21/8806 (US);
G01N21/8851 (US);
G01N2021/8854 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOGRAFISCHE PRÜFVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2023/14] | English: | THERMOGRAPHIC INSPECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2023/14] | French: | APPAREIL D'ESSAI THERMOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005286606 (IGNATOWICZ STEVEN [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 2-7; | [A]WO2015140797 (D I R TECHNOLOGIES DETECTION IR LTD [IL]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2017067549 (ANRITSU INFIVIS CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2020041840 (IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI KK, et al) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [Y] - CRUZ SAMUEL ET AL, "Real-Time Quality Control of Heat Sealed Bottles Using Thermal Images and Artificial Neural Network", JOURNAL OF IMAGING, (20210203), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.3390/jimaging7020024, page 24, XP093019749 [Y] 2-7 * page 2, paragraph 1.2 * * page 10, paragraph 5 * * page 15, paragraph 6.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/jimaging7020024 | by applicant | JP2017083403 |