EP4135431 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHODS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/07] | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - German title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - English title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - French title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Zhihua Dongguan, 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhi Dongguan, 523860 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22198561.7 | 14.11.2017 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135431 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP);
H04W4/06 (RU,US);
H04W68/005 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (CN);
H04W68/02 (KR,RU);
H04W72/0446 (CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2024/41] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHODS AND DEVICES | [2024/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2023/07] | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
Former [2023/07] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17932242.5 / EP3709679 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |