EP4344641 - CABLE GUIDANCE IN MOVABLE MEDICAL APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROON, Gerardus Bernardus Eindhoven / NL | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 22198618.5 | 29.09.2022 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344641 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, H02G3/38, A61B6/03 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A61B6/00 (EP);
A61B6/035 (EP);
A61B6/56 (EP);
H02G11/00 (EP);
H02G3/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELFÜHRUNG IN BEWEGLICHEN MEDIZINISCHEN GERÄTEN | [2024/14] | English: | CABLE GUIDANCE IN MOVABLE MEDICAL APPLIANCES | [2024/14] | French: | GUIDAGE DE CÂBLE DANS DES APPAREILS MÉDICAUX MOBILES | [2024/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4040755 (JORGENSEN GEORGE N, et al) [A] 1-15 * fig. 4, c. 5, l.56 - c. 6, l. 14 *; | [A]JPH01177813 (MIRAI IND) [A] 1-15 * (23), (10);; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1482613 (NOVAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [AD]US2014037071 (FOERNER ULRICH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2014037071 |