EP4254141 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Business Innovation Corp. 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAJIYAMA, Kohei Yokohama / JP | 02 /
AWATSU, Yusaku Yokohama / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22198772.0 | 29.09.2022 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | JP20220052530 | 28.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022052530 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254141 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/048, G06F3/12 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G06F3/04845 (EP);
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F3/1208 (EP);
G06F3/1253 (EP);
G06F3/1256 (EP);
G06F3/1285 (EP);
G06K15/02 (US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T3/60 (US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2023/40] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014207007 (OCE TECH BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,7,14,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 28 * * page 8, line 9 - page 24, line 1; figures 1-16 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]EP3106312 (ROLAND DG CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-13 * [I] 1-15; | [A]US2022035516 (TOKUNAGA NATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | JPH0611870B | JP2014211769 |