EP4191819 - WIRELESS CHARGING METHOD FOR URBAN AIR MOBILITY AND DEVICE AND SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd. (Yeoksam-dong) 203, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06141 / KR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOW, Young Soo 16898 Yongin-si / KR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22198996.5 | 30.09.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | KR20210168907 | 30.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210168907 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191819 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4191819 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, B60L53/68, H02J50/12, H02J50/80, H02J50/90 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H02J50/90 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/38 (EP,KR);
B60L53/12 (CN,US);
B64F1/362 (US);
B60L53/126 (EP,CN);
B60L53/36 (EP);
B60L53/37 (EP);
B60L53/60 (CN);
B60L53/68 (EP);
B60L58/12 (KR);
B60R25/245 (KR);
B64C27/57 (KR);
B64C39/024 (US);
B64D27/24 (KR);
H02J50/10 (KR,US);
H02J50/12 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP);
B60L2200/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/622 (EP);
B60Y2200/51 (KR);
B64C29/0008 (US);
B64U2201/20 (US);
B64U50/19 (US);
H02J2310/44 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES LADEVERFAHREN FÜR MOBILITÄT VON STÄDTISCHER LUFT UND VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2023/23] | English: | WIRELESS CHARGING METHOD FOR URBAN AIR MOBILITY AND DEVICE AND SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE SANS FIL POUR MOBILITÉ AÉRIENNE URBAINE ET DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3101778 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US9927809 (TOFTE NATHAN L [US], et al) [Y] 2,10 * page 13, line 58 - page 14, line 5; figure 4a *; | [XY]US2018257502 (PARK SUNG SOO [KR]) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0222] - [0224]; figure 25 * [Y] 2,10; | [A]US2020130864 (BROCKERS ROLAND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR20210168907 |