EP4159044 - HEATING SYSTEM FOR COLD DRINK APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bunn-O-Matic Corporation 5020 Ash Grove Dr. Springfield, Illinois 62711 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADYK, Jeffery W. Springfield / US | 02 /
MORTON, Joel Springfield / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22199089.8 | 30.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | US202163250838P | 30.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163250838 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159044 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/04, A23G9/22, A23G9/28 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A23G9/045 (EP,US);
A23G9/12 (US);
A23G9/18 (US);
A23G9/22 (EP);
A23G9/228 (US);
A23G9/28 (EP);
A23G9/281 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZSYSTEM FÜR KALTGETRÄNKEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/14] | English: | HEATING SYSTEM FOR COLD DRINK APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE | [2023/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE POUR APPAREIL DE BOISSON FROIDE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5967226 (CHOI SANG KYONG [KR]); | [AD]US6430952 (MIDDEN WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [X]US6513578 (FRANK JIMMY I [US]); | [A]US7712321 (KADYK JEFFREY W [US]); | [X]WO2018020449 (S P M DRINK SYSTEMS SPA [IT]); | [X]CN208458364U (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA); | [X]CN208925146U (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA); | [X]EP3305089 (ALI GROUP SRL CARPIGIANI [IT]); | [X]EP3305090 (ALI GROUP SRL CARPIGIANI [IT]); | [X]EP3434112 (ALI GROUP SRL CARPIGIANI [IT]) | by applicant | US6430952 |