EP4171175 - HYBRID POWER SUPPLY SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND DEVICES FOR EXCIMER LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 20.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | 20.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yongduk Vernon / US | 02 /
PEARSON, Matthew Robert Hartford / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22199637.4 | 04.10.2022 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US202117506573 | 20.10.2021 Original published format: US202117506573 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4171175 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/282 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H05B41/282 (EP);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61L9/20 (US);
H01J61/56 (US);
H01J65/048 (US);
H05B41/2806 (US);
A61L2202/11 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR EXCIMER-LAMPEN | [2023/17] | English: | HYBRID POWER SUPPLY SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND DEVICES FOR EXCIMER LAMPS | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE HYBRIDE POUR LAMPES À EXCIMÈRES | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 19.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - Mame Andallah Diop, "Alimentation sans transformateur pour dispositif de décharge à barrière diélectrique (DBD)", (20181023), URL: https://theses.hal.science/tel-01902468, (20230216), XP093024445 [X] 1,3,7,13-15 * figures 3.2, 3.6, 3.7 * * page 94 - page 103 * [Y] 2,4,8-12 [I] 5,6 | [X] - DIOP MAME ANDALLAH ET AL, "10 kV SiC MOSFET Evaluation for Dielectric Barrier Discharge Transformerless Power Supply", PLASMA, (20200818), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.3390/plasma3030009, pages 103 - 116, XP093024419 [X] 1,3,7,13-15 * figure 1b * * page 103 - page 110 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/plasma3030009 | [Y] - LEFRANC PIERRE ET AL, "Optimisation and characterisation of a planar transformer with a high voltage ratio and high output voltage for plasma reactors", IET POWER ELECTRONICS, IET, UK, (20151231), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1049/IET-PEL.2014.0139, ISSN 1755-4535, pages 929 - 937, XP006052397 [Y] 4,8-12 * page 929 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-pel.2014.0139 | [Y] - RUEDA VANESA ET AL, "Optimum transformer turns ratio for the power supply of dielectric barrier discharge lamps", IET POWER ELECTRONICS, IET, UK, (20180112), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1049/IET-PEL.2016.0497, ISSN 1755-4535, pages 62 - 67, XP006065167 [Y] 2 * page 62 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/iet-pel.2016.0497 |