EP4202688 - MANAGEMENT OF MICROSERVICES FAILOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POORNACHANDRAN, Rajesh Portland, OR, 97229 / US | 02 /
CARRANZA, Marcos Portland, OR, 97229 / US | 03 /
DOSHI, Kshitij Tempe AZ, 85282 / US | 04 /
GUIM BERNAT, Francesc 08036 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
KUMAR, Karthik Chandler AZ, 85249 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22200046.5 | 06.10.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | US202117560857 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: US202117560857 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202688 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20, G06F11/30, G06F11/34 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06F11/2025 (EP,US);
G06F11/0712 (CN);
G06F11/079 (CN);
G06F11/1484 (EP);
G06F11/1641 (EP);
G06F11/165 (EP);
G06F11/202 (EP);
G06F11/2023 (EP);
G06F11/2028 (EP,US);
G06F11/203 (EP);
G06F11/2038 (EP);
G06F11/2041 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON MIKRODIENSTAUSFALLSICHERUNG | [2023/26] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF MICROSERVICES FAILOVER | [2023/26] | French: | GESTION DE BASCULEMENT DE MICROSERVICES | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020228433 (LEE CHUNGHAN [JP]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0043] , [0059] - [0062] - [0100] - [0121]; figures 3,5,6,10,11 *; | [A]US2021117249 (DOSHI KSHITIJ A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 19,23b,28a-28e * * paragraphs [0148] , [0149] , [0171] - [0177] - [0192] - [0199] - [0214] , [0230] , [0251] , [0256] , [0263] - [0269] * * paragraphs [0312] , [0313] , [0335] , [0380] *; | [A]US2021392477 (TAFT DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0042] - [0046] * |