EP4353386 - A CUTTING TOOL COMPRISING A CUTTING EDGE AND A METHOD FOR INDEXING SUCH A CUTTING EDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ekdén, Dan SE-737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22200705.6 | 11.10.2022 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353386 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
B23B27/1625 (EP);
B23B2200/0461 (EP);
B23B2200/088 (EP);
B23B2200/165 (EP);
B23B2205/04 (EP);
B23B2205/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG MIT EINER SCHNEIDKANTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM INDEXIEREN SOLCH EINER SCHNEIDKANTE | [2024/16] | English: | A CUTTING TOOL COMPRISING A CUTTING EDGE AND A METHOD FOR INDEXING SUCH A CUTTING EDGE | [2024/16] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE COMPRENANT UN BORD DE COUPE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INDEXATION D'UN TEL BORD DE COUPE | [2024/16] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1191063 (ROLLS ROYCE) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 70 - line 90; figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2009131915 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102009049088 (MAPAL FAB PRAEZISION [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [Y]US2013051941 (BEN AMOR RAOUF [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2014086694 (FANG X DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1,10* paragraph [0073]; figure 15 *; | [Y]US2014356085 (CANELA VINAS ALEXANDRE [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030]; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE102009049088 |