EP4166776 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE PLAUSIBILITY OF AN AIR FLOW SENSOR IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/10] | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | ||
Former [2023/16] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMANCE, HUGO 91510 Lardy / FR | 02 /
LEFEVRE, CEDRIC 91510 LARDY / FR | 03 /
PEREIRA, LUC 91510 LARDY / FR | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [2024/43] | Application number, filing date | 22200736.1 | 11.10.2022 | [2023/16] | Priority number, date | FR20210010899 | 14.10.2021 Original published format: FR 2110899 | [2023/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4166776 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4166776 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/18, F02D41/22 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
F02D41/1456 (EP);
F02D41/0055 (EP);
F02D41/0072 (EP);
F02D41/18 (EP);
F02D41/222 (EP);
F02D2200/0402 (EP);
F02D41/003 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] |
Former [2023/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DER PLAUSIBILITÄT EINES LUFTDURCHFLUSSMESSERSENSORS IN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2023/16] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING THE PLAUSIBILITY OF AN AIR FLOW SENSOR IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2023/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA PLAUSIBILITÉ DE DÉRIVE D'UN CAPTEUR DÉBITMÈTRE D'AIR DANS UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5384707 (KERNS JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE10341010 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] *; | [A]WO2011067097 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* page 4, paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP2543857 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0028] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102016220029 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] * | by applicant | FR2010965 | JP2006329138 | US2008270011 | DE102014105838 | FR3053117 |