EP4186725 - AIR CONDITIONING ASSEMBLY WITH CONTROLLED EJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 22.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Jessica 38165 Lehre / DE | 02 /
Sawall, Philipp Hildesheim 31141 / DE | 03 /
Schiller, Heino 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22200855.9 | 11.10.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DE202110213208 | 24.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021213208 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186725 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25B9/08 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B60H1/32284 (EP);
F25B9/008 (EP,CN,US);
B60H1/00899 (US);
B60H1/00328 (CN);
B60H1/3228 (EP);
F25B41/00 (EP);
F25B41/20 (EP);
F25B41/40 (CN);
F25B43/00 (CN);
F25B9/08 (CN);
B60H2001/3298 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP);
F25B2341/0011 (EP);
F25B2341/0012 (EP);
F25B2341/0015 (EP);
F25B2400/0407 (EP);
F25B2400/121 (EP);
F25B2400/23 (EP);
F25B2600/2501 (EP);
F25B40/00 (EP);
F25B5/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNGSANORDNUNG MIT GEREGELTEM EJEKTOR | [2023/22] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING ASSEMBLY WITH CONTROLLED EJECTOR | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION À ÉJECTEUR RÉGULÉ | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004123624 (OHTA HIROMI [JP], et al); | [XY]DE102008005076 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XY]DE102008011255 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [Y]CN103808101 (HEFEI MEILING CO LTD); | [Y]DE112014002876T (DENSO CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US7254961 | JP2008082614 | US7428826 | US7707849 | US7726150 | WO2018159322 |