EP4187227 - MEASURING INSTRUMENT AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | 08.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCANGRADING ApS Sukkerfabrikken 80 4990 Sakskøbing / DK | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egholm, Janus 3520 Farum / DK | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22201020.9 | 12.10.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DK2021PA01128 | 28.11.2021 Original published format: DK PA202101128 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187227 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, B07C5/342, // G01N15/14 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G01N15/0227 (EP);
G01N15/0255 (EP);
G01N15/1427 (EP);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
G01N15/149 (EP);
G01N2015/0288 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSINSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2023/22] | English: | MEASURING INSTRUMENT AND METHOD OF USE | [2023/22] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001337027 (NAKAYAMA IRON WORKS LTD, et al) [Y] 5-7* paragraph [0043] *; | [Y]US2006055934 (SUNSHINE GREGG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] , [0077] , [0103]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP3507586 (SCANGRADING APS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0027] , [0030] , [0058]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP3507586 |