Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
22.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
25.08.2023 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
28.07.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 | Change or deletion - publication of search report | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
09.06.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
28.04.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.10.2022 | Change - representative |