Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4253903 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2024 | B1 | EP4253903 | 29.11.2023 | A3 | EP4253903 | 04.10.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102021130870 | 25.11.2021 | EP22202743 | 20.10.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023175833 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021130870 | 25.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116164689 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102021130870 | 25.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4187195 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | A3 | EP4187195 | 31.05.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102021130870 | 25.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021130870 | 15.12.2022 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102021130870 | 25.11.2021 | Type | Divisional application | EP4253903 |