EP4356745 - SMOKER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protech Food Machinery AB Tommabodavägen 3 283 71 Lönsboda / SE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, Mats SE283 72 Lönsboda / SE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Industripatent i Växjö AB Box 3130 350 43 Växjö / SE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22203159.3 | 21.10.2022 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356745 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23B4/044, A23B4/052 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A23B4/044 (EP);
A23B4/052 (US);
A23B4/0523 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHERSYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | SMOKER SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FUMOIR | [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3643587 (HARRINGTON HERBERT A, et al); | [XI]US4309938 (HARMON JOHN R); | [XI]US6099882 (RISNER JR SPENCER CHARLES [US], et al); | [XI]US6142066 (ANDERS GARY H [US], et al); | [XI]WO2010144855 (CONAGRA FOODS LAMB WESTON INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US10271559 |