EP4361014 - TOWING VESSEL SYSTEM WITH SAFETY TOW TOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecklenborg, Kegel GmbH Herwigstraße 36 27572 Bremerhaven / DE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klünder, Carsten 27474 Cuxhaven / DE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22203417.5 | 24.10.2022 | [2024/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361014 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/56, B63B35/68, B63B34/60, B60D1/18, D07B1/02, D07B5/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B63B21/56 (EP);
B63B34/60 (EP);
B63B35/68 (EP);
D07B2201/1004 (EP);
D07B5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEPPSCHIFFSYSTEM MIT SICHERUNGSSCHLEPPTAU | [2024/18] | English: | TOWING VESSEL SYSTEM WITH SAFETY TOW TOW | [2024/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REMORQUEUR AVEC REMORQUE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6221889 (S SHIRAI & CO LTD) [X] 6* figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2019031304 (BANGSLUND THOMAS [DK]) [X] 1-8 * figures 7, 15 * * paragraph [0081] *; | [XI]US11332216 (PLANTE THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * figures 12, 14, 15 * * columns 5-6, lines 55-3 * [I] 4 | by applicant | DE65697 |