Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4145275 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202011506271 EP20208101 EP22203480 US202016833478 US202117341068



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11556341Global Dossier 17.01.2023B2
US2022012059 13.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202016833478 27.03.2020
US202117341068 07.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4145275Global Dossier 08.03.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202016833478 27.03.2020
EP20208101 17.11.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11029957Global Dossier 08.06.2021B1
Priority number Date
US202016833478 27.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3885901Global Dossier 26.10.2022B1
EP3885901 29.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016833478 27.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN113448620Global Dossier 28.09.2021A
Priority number Date
US202016833478 27.03.2020
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3885901