Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
30.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
26.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.04.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 | Change - classification | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
03.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
26.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.10.2022 | Change - representative |