EP4159100 - ROBOT CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Bohyun 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
SHIM, Inbo 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
SUNG, Jihoon 08592 Soul / KR | 04 /
PARK, Sojin 08592 Seoul / KR | 05 /
SONG, Seunghyun 08592 Seoul / KR | 06 /
LEE, Sangkyu 08592 Seoul / KR | 07 /
JUN, Woochan 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22203554.5 | 19.05.2017 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | KR20160062415 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160062415 | KR20160072690 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160072690 | KR20160109306 | 26.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160109306 | KR20160141106 | 27.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160141106 | KR20160184446 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160184446 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4159100 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4159100 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A47L9/00 (EP);
A47L9/122 (EP,RU,US);
G05D1/0248 (EP,US);
A47L11/33 (US);
A47L11/4013 (US);
A47L11/4061 (US);
A47L11/4066 (US);
A47L11/4069 (US);
A47L5/22 (US);
A47L5/30 (US);
A47L9/0072 (EP);
A47L9/009 (EP,US);
A47L9/02 (EP);
A47L9/04 (EP);
A47L9/0411 (EP);
A47L9/0477 (EP,US);
A47L9/0488 (EP);
A47L9/0494 (EP);
A47L9/106 (US);
A47L9/1427 (EP);
A47L9/16 (EP);
A47L9/1608 (EP,US);
A47L9/1616 (EP);
A47L9/1633 (EP,US);
A47L9/1641 (EP,US);
A47L9/165 (EP);
A47L9/1658 (EP);
A47L9/1666 (EP);
A47L9/1683 (EP,US);
A47L9/1691 (EP,US);
A47L9/28 (EP);
A47L9/2826 (EP,US);
A47L9/2852 (EP,US);
A47L9/2857 (EP,US);
A47L9/2868 (EP);
A47L9/2873 (US);
A47L9/2884 (EP,US);
A47L9/2894 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/228 (US);
G05D1/247 (US);
A47L2201/00 (EP,US);
A47L2201/022 (US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,US);
A47L2201/06 (US);
A47L9/10 (US);
A47L9/12 (US);
A47L9/1409 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSROBOTER | [2023/14] | English: | ROBOT CLEANER | [2023/14] | French: | ROBOT NETTOYEUR | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17799701.2 / EP3459412 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016100733 (KIM BYUNG CHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1,2; claim - * | by applicant | US2013061420 | US2013061417 | US2013305484 |