EP4181648 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jeong Seok Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
PARK, Woo Cheol Asan-si / KR | 03 /
YOON, Kwan Hyuck Seoul / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hye Kyun Seoul / KR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 22203894.5 | 26.10.2022 | [2023/20] | Priority number, date | KR20210157219 | 16.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210157219 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4181648 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4181648 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/121, H10K59/80 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H10K59/121 (EP);
H10K59/30 (KR);
H01L27/1214 (CN);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K50/8445 (KR,US);
H10K50/858 (US);
H10K59/1213 (EP);
H10K59/122 (KR);
H10K59/123 (KR);
H10K59/40 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/8731 (EP);
H10K59/38 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/20] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3633750 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0081] , [0082] , [0092]; figure 5B *; | [Y]CN111063719 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0062]; figures 5-6 *; | [Y]CN111785853 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0095]; figures 1-4,22 *; | [Y]US2020357871 (CHUNG JIN KOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0207]; figure 15 *; | [Y]US2021012706 (YANG XINGXING [CN], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph 34 - sentence 69; examples 1-11 *; | [Y]US2021083012 (BYUN JINSU [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7* paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0158]; figures 5-11 *; | [Y]WO2021147160 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0119]; figures 1-5,7 *; | [Y]US2021305537 (SONG HYUN GUE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figure 5; claims 1-4 *; | [YP]US2022045155 (MA YANGZHAO [CN], et al) [YP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0040] - [0051] - [0079] - [0081]; figures 1-4,11 *; | [YP]US2022123094 (QIU YUANYOU [CN], et al) [YP] 1-7 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0119]; figures 1-5, 7 * |