EP4361411 - TRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuji, Kenichiro Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nakasuka, Hiroki Osaka / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Ryuichi Osaka / JP | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22203947.1 | 26.10.2022 | [2024/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361411 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N2590/08 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2610/1406 (EP);
F01N2610/1433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAKTOR | [2024/18] | English: | TRACTOR | [2024/18] | French: | TRACTEUR | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 04.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015012169 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [ID]JP2015045234 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [ID] 1-7 * paragraphs [0072] - [0073]; figures 1-4; claims 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2015045234 |