EP4105896 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND PLATFORM OF GENERATING DOCUMENT, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Qunyi Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
QIN, Xiameng Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
EN, Mengyi Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Dongdong Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
HUANG, Ju Beijing, 100085 / CN | 06 /
XU, Yangliu Beijing, 100085 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Yi Beijing, 100085 / CN | 08 /
YAO, Kun Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22204132.9 | 27.10.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | CN202111260590 | 27.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111260590 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4105896 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4105896 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V30/40 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G06V30/42 (EP);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
G06V10/242 (US);
G06V10/751 (US);
G06V10/764 (US);
G06V30/147 (EP);
G06V30/412 (EP);
G06V30/414 (US);
G06V10/82 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND PLATTFORM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DOKUMENTS, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2022/51] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND PLATFORM OF GENERATING DOCUMENT, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PLATEFORME DE GÉNÉRATION DE DOCUMENT, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 02.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/07] | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3511861 (ONFIDO LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0096] *; | [I]US2019236350 (KOZLOVSKY VITALY STANISLAVOVITCH [RU], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0084] *; | [I]US2020074169 (MUKHOPADHYAY ABHISEK [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] ** paragraph [0061] *; | [XI]US2021150338 (SEMENOV STANISLAV [RU]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * [I] 1-15 |