EP4293533 - NATIVE MULTI-TENANCY FOR DATABASE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREI, Mihnea 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
BOEHM, Alexander 69190 Walldorf / DE | 03 /
MAY, Norman 69190 Walldorf / DE | 04 /
KLINGSPORN, Urs 69190 Walldorf / DE | 05 /
BLOCK, Meinolf 69190 Walldorf / DE | 06 /
VOELKER, Patrick 69190 Walldorf / DE | 07 /
KIM, Hyunjun 69190 Walldorf / DE | 08 /
GLEBE, Thorsten 69190 Walldorf / DE | 09 /
BREGLER, Jonathan 69190 Walldorf / DE | 10 /
CHOI, Jaeyoung 69190 Walldorf / DE | 11 /
KITTEL, Martin 69190 Walldorf / DE | 12 /
KWON, Yong Sik 69190 Walldorf / DE | 13 /
HAHN, Uwe 69190 Walldorf / DE | 14 /
ZAHN, Henning 69190 Walldorf / DE | 15 /
HANDRECK, Melanie 69190 Walldorf / DE | 16 /
MACK, Holger 69190 Walldorf / DE | 17 /
KIM, Eunsang 69190 Walldorf / DE | 18 /
RENKES, Frank 69190 Walldorf / DE | 19 /
LEE, Juchang 69190 Walldorf / DE | 20 /
SCHINDEWOLF, Martin 69190 Walldorf / DE | 21 /
BOWMAN, Ivan 69190 Walldorf / DE | 22 /
DANNECKER, Lars 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22204505.6 | 28.10.2022 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US202263352779P | 16.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263352779 P | US202263352811P | 16.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263352811 P | US202217892597 | 22.08.2022 Original published format: US202217892597 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293533 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06F21/62 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP);
G06F21/6227 (US);
G06F21/602 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
H04L9/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATIVE MEHRFACH-TENANCY FÜR EIN DATENBANKSYSTEM | [2023/51] | English: | NATIVE MULTI-TENANCY FOR DATABASE SYSTEM | [2023/51] | French: | LOCATAIRES MULTIPLES NATIFS POUR SYSTÈME DE BASE DE DONNÉES | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014074539 (DOERING JEFFREY RYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0141]; figure 7E *; | [A]WO2018053258 (ORACLE INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0124] *; | [YA]US2019173674 (AGARWAL AMIT [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 1,2,5-7,10,11,14,15; | [YA]US2020250325 (CHONG TERRY [US], et al) [Y] 5,10,14,15 * paragraph [0044]; figure 6 * [A] 1-4,6-9,11-13; | [XY] - OLIVER SCHILLER ET AL, "Native support of multi-tenancy in RDBMS for software as a service", EXTENDING DATABASE TECHNOLOGY, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20110321), doi:10.1145/1951365.1951382, ISBN 978-1-4503-0528-0, pages 117 - 128, XP058002015 [X] 1,2,6,7,11 * sections 2 and 2.1 * [Y] 3-5,8-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1951365.1951382 | by applicant | US19790633527 |