EP4173957 - POWER MANAGEMENT IN A HYBRID-ELECTRIC PROPULSION SYSTEM DURING SINGLE ENGINE FAILURE AT DESCENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/18] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIG, Zubair Ahmed South Windsor, 06074 / US | 02 /
DUSHEK, Matt East Hartford, 06118 / US | 03 /
AMARI, Martin Richard Glastonbury, 06033 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22204532.0 | 28.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US202163273452P | 29.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163273452 P | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173957 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/24, B64D31/06, B60L50/00, B64D27/02 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B64D27/24 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP);
B60L50/61 (EP);
B64D27/026 (EP,US);
B64D27/14 (US);
B64D31/00 (US);
B64D31/06 (EP);
B64D31/18 (EP);
F02C6/00 (US);
H02K7/1823 (US);
B60L2200/10 (EP);
B60L2220/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEMANAGEMENT BEI AUSFALL EINES TRIEBWERKS IM SINKFLUG FÜR EIN HYBRID-ELEKTRISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2023/18] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT IN A HYBRID-ELECTRIC PROPULSION SYSTEM DURING SINGLE ENGINE FAILURE AT DESCENT | [2023/18] | French: | GESTION DE PUISSANCE D'UNE PROPULSION HYBRIDE-ÉLECTRIQUE EN CAS DE DÉFAILLANCE D'UN MOTEUR PENDANT DESCENTE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016061053 (THOMASSIN JEAN [CA]); | [XI]US2020079518 (LATULIPE ERIC [CA], et al); | [I]US2020307813 (PEKOVIC TATJANA [CA]); | [I]EP3772148 (RAYTHEON TECH CORP [US]); | [XI]US2021222629 (TERWILLIGER NEIL [US]) |