EP4195289 - METAL CARBON BARRIER REGION FOR NMOS DEVICE CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEN GUPTA, Arnab Hillsboro, 97124 / US | 02 /
DEWEY, Gilbert Beaverton, 97006 / US | 03 /
CHOUKSEY, Siddharth Portland, 97229 / US | 04 /
HARATIPOUR, Nazila Portland, 97209 / US | 05 /
KAVALIEROS, Jack Portland, 97229 / US | 06 /
METZ, Mathew Portland, 97229 / US | 07 /
CLENDENNING, Scott Portland, 97225 / US | 08 /
RETASKET, Jason Beaverton, 97007 / US | 09 /
JOHNSON, Edward Saint Helens, 97051 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 22204877.9 | 01.11.2022 | [2023/24] | Priority number, date | US202117546461 | 09.12.2021 Original published format: US202117546461 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195289 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/45, H01L29/417, // H01L29/78 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01L29/456 (EP,CN);
H01L29/45 (CN);
H01L29/78618 (US);
H01L29/41725 (EP);
H01L29/66477 (CN);
H01L29/66742 (US);
H01L29/66795 (CN);
H01L29/78 (CN);
H01L29/785 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLKOHLENSTOFFBARRIEREREGION FÜR KONTAKTE EINER NMOS-VORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | METAL CARBON BARRIER REGION FOR NMOS DEVICE CONTACTS | [2023/24] | French: | ZONE DE BARRIÈRE EN CARBONE MÉTALLIQUE POUR CONTACTS DE DISPOSITIF NMOS | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013032794 (LEE YONG SU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,12-15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-3,5 * [I] 3,6,7,11; | [XI]US2019164896 (KOIKE JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11-15 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * [I] 6,7; | [L]US2022102521 (DEWEY GILBERT [US], et al) [L] 1-15* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1B * |