EP4186381 - KNEEPAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 03.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | 03.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engelbert Strauss GmbH & Co. KG Frankfurter Str. 108 63599 Biebergemünd / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIENEN, Phillipp 63619 Bad Orb / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22204891.0 | 01.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DE202110130480 | 22.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021130480 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186381 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/06 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A41D13/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNIESCHONER | [2023/22] | English: | KNEEPAD | [2023/22] | French: | GENOUILLÈRE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 02.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014259325 (BEHREND CARL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,13-15 * the whole document *[I] 4; | [XI]WO2015103634 (FERRARA LISA [US]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 8,9 | by applicant | EP1177732 | DE202008013477U | DE202008013801U | WO2009039410 | EP2956822 | DE102016120379 | US2018126630 | DE102018205457 | US2020113267 |