EP4336574 - SOLAR CELL AND PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO., LTD. No. 58, Yuan Xi Road Yuan Hua Town Haining, Zhejiang / CN | For all designated states JINKO SOLAR CO., LTD. No. 1 Jinko Road Shangrao Economic Development Zone Shangrao, Jiangxi 334100 / CN | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Jie HAINING / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhao HAINING / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Peiting HAINING / CN | 04 /
YANG, Jie HAINING / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Xinyu HAINING / CN | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22204989.2 | 02.11.2022 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | CN20221198333 | 08.09.2022 Original published format: CN202211098333 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4336574 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0747 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H01L31/0745 (EP);
H01L31/02168 (CN);
H01L31/022441 (US);
H01L31/02008 (US);
H01L31/022425 (EP);
H01L31/02363 (CN);
H01L31/035209 (US);
H01L31/0368 (EP);
H01L31/048 (CN);
H01L31/0481 (US);
H01L31/0504 (CN);
H01L31/0747 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARZELLE UND FOTOVOLTAISCHES MODUL | [2024/11] | English: | SOLAR CELL AND PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE | [2024/11] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE ET MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021399150 (HILALI MOHAMED M [US], et al); | [A]EP3979336 (ZHEJIANG JINKO SOLAR CO LTD [CN], et al); |