EP4364645 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING VITAL DATA OF AN OCCUPANT OF A VEHCILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 02.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIND, Niclas 40531 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
SWÄRD, Billy 40531 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
MAGNUSSON, Klara 40531 Göteborg / SE | 04 /
VINNÅ, Bure Råman 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22205349.8 | 03.11.2022 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364645 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/6893 (EP);
A61B5/7445 (EP);
B60K35/22 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP);
A61B5/747 (EP);
B60K2360/563 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON VITALDATEN EINES FAHRZEUGINSASSEN | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING VITAL DATA OF AN OCCUPANT OF A VEHCILE | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE DONNÉES VITALES D'UN OCCUPANT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2024/19] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 27.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013338465 (TAUB MARC BARRY [US], et al); | [Y]US2014106726 (CROSBIE JOHN EDWARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2016066127 (CHOI JONG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2017020444 (LURIE YAIR [US]); | [Y]US2019061772 (PRINZ THOMAS [DE]); | [Y]US2022047215 (BAEK HYUN-JAE [KR], et al) |