EP4178071 - BATTERY BANK UNIT, REMAINING CHARGE TIME CALCULATION METHOD, AND REMAINING CHARGE TIME CALCULATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FDK Corporation 1-6-41 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8212 / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Shun Tokyo, 108-8212 / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Kenji Tokyo, 108-8212 / JP | 03 /
Katsube, Yasuyuki Tokyo, 108-8212 / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | karo IP karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB Postfach 32 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22205371.2 | 03.11.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | JP20210181218 | 05.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021181218 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178071 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/0063 (US);
H02J7/0025 (US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (US);
H02J7/007194 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEBANKEINHEIT, VERFAHREN ZUR BERECHNUNG DER VERBLEIBENDEN LADEZEIT UND PROGRAMM ZUR BERECHNUNG DER VERBLEIBENDEN LADEZEIT | [2023/19] | English: | BATTERY BANK UNIT, REMAINING CHARGE TIME CALCULATION METHOD, AND REMAINING CHARGE TIME CALCULATION PROGRAM | [2023/19] | French: | UNITÉ DE BATTERIE DE BATTERIES, PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE TEMPS DE CHARGE RESTANT, ET PROGRAMME DE CALCUL DE TEMPS DE CHARGE RESTANT | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013009605 (HONGO HIROO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1,2,3a-c * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]US2015249355 (TAKANO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]US2017063150 (SAKAMOTO JINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050] *; | [Y]US2020309857 (ZEYGHAMI SAMANE [US], et al) [Y] 4* paragraph [0034] * | by applicant | JP2016010250 |