EP4190978 - DEVICE FOR DRIVING A MOBILE, IN PARTICULAR ELECTRIC, WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Neuson Linz GmbH Flughafenstraße 7 4063 Hörsching / AT | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finzel, Robert 4060 Leonding / AT | 02 /
Löhr, Christian 4060 Leonding / AT | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22205515.4 | 04.11.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | AT20210050885 | 09.11.2021 Original published format: AT 508852021 | [2023/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190978 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, E02F9/22, F15B7/00 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
E02F9/207 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (AT);
E02F9/2228 (EP);
E02F9/2232 (AT);
E02F9/2235 (EP);
F15B18/00 (EP);
F15B2211/20592 (EP);
F15B2211/6653 (EP);
F15B2211/7051 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER MOBILEN, INSBESONDERE ELEKTRISCHEN ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2023/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRIVING A MOBILE, IN PARTICULAR ELECTRIC, WORK MACHINE | [2023/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL MOBILE, EN PARTICULIER ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/19] | 05.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1455439 (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0026] , [0028]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE60037740T (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-10 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP2444555 (TAKEUCHI MFG [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,10* paragraphs [0011] , [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP2288758 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP AB [SE]) [X] 1,4,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0031] , [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP3567166 (TAKEUCHI MFG [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP3705733 (WACKER NEUSON LINZ GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0049] , [0080] , [0085]; figure 2 * |