EP4155293 - PRC1 INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-2590 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIERPICKI, Tomasz Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | 02 /
GREMBECKA, Jolanta Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | 03 /
YING, Weijiang Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | 04 /
YAO, Yiwu Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | 05 /
GRAY, Felicia Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | 06 /
ZHAO, Qingjie Ann Arbor, 48109 / US | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 22205619.4 | 07.06.2019 | [2023/13] | Priority number, date | US201862681989P | 07.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862681989 P | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155293 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/32, C07D207/333, C07D207/337, C07D403/14, A61K8/49, A61K31/215, A61K31/216, C07D405/14, C07D471/04, A61P35/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/4184 (EP);
A61K31/422 (EP);
A61K31/427 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP);
C07D333/40 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/16 (EP,US);
C07D493/10 (EP,US);
C07D498/06 (EP,US);
C07D498/16 (US);
C07D513/16 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/422, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/427, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/428, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PRC1-INHIBITOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DAMIT | [2023/13] | English: | PRC1 INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT THEREWITH | [2023/13] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PRC1 ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT COMPRENANT CES DERNIERS | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 29.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19815644.0 / EP3813784 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015030847 (PTC THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | by applicant | US510 | US949 | US5863 | US5861 | US3598122 | US3598123 | US3710795 | US3731683 | US3742951 | US3814097 | US3921636 | US3972995 | US3993072 | US3993073 | US3996934 | US4031894 | US4060084 | US4069307 | US4077407 | US4151273 | US4201211 | US4229447 | US4230105 | US4292299 | US4292303 | US4343789 | US4476116 | US4596795 | US4755386 | WO9005719 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5116817 | US5281420 | US5323907 | EP0606046 | US5336168 | US5340591 | US5456923 | WO9627583 | WO9633172 | EP0780386 | US5665378 | US5700485 | WO9801113 | WO9803516 | WO9807697 | US5723269 | US5739136 | WO9830566 | WO9833768 | WO9834918 | WO9834915 | US5837280 | US5858401 | US5869090 | WO9929667 | EP0931788 | WO9952910 | WO9952889 | US6083518 | US6391452 | US6667048 | US2004013734 | US6923983 | US6929801 | US6946144 | US6960563 | US19640601484 | EP19970304971 | EP19990302232 | GB19990012961 | EP19990308617 |