EP4178326 - PATTERN TRANSFER PRINTING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuhan Dr Laser Technology Corp., Ltd. No. 5, Road 2 Hushi Park East Lake high tech development zone Wuhan 430223 / CN | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGRA, Gad 7405845 9 Nachmias Shmuel St., Ness Ziona / IL | 02 /
COHEN, Eyal 4420801 1 Keren Avraham St., Kfar-Saba / IL | 03 /
YUNGER, Eran 8548000 Meshek 66, Moshav Sdei Avraham / IL | 04 /
FINAROV, Moshe 7647013 16/7 Einstein Street, Rechovot / IL | 05 /
XU, Tao No. 5, Road 2 Hushi Park, East Lake high tech development zone, Wuhan, 430223 / CN | 06 /
SHI, Jing No. 5, Road 2 Hushi Park, East Lake high tech development zone, Wuhan, 430223 / CN | 07 /
TONG, Weiguo No. 5, Road 2 Hushi Park, East Lake high tech development zone, Wuhan, 430223 / CN | 08 /
LI, Zhigang No. 5, Road 2 Hushi Park, East Lake high tech development zone, Wuhan, 430223 / CN | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22205647.5 | 04.11.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | CN202111321391 | 09.11.2021 Original published format: CN202111321391 | CN202122732445U | 09.11.2021 Original published format: CN 202122732445 U | IL20220290194 | 19.01.2022 Original published format: IL 29019422 | US202217583440 | 25.01.2022 Original published format: US202217583440 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178326 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/12, B41F16/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B41F16/008 (EP);
H05K3/107 (KR);
B41J2/442 (KR);
B41M5/24 (KR);
H05K1/0393 (KR);
H05K3/1258 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFERDRUCK DURCH MUSTERÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/19] | English: | PATTERN TRANSFER PRINTING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION PAR TRANSFERT DE MOTIF | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009074987 (AUYEUNG RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XI]US2011097550 (MATUSOVSKY MIKHAEL [IL], et al) [X] 1,13 * figures 4,5A,5B,5C * * paragraphs [0139] - [0149] * [I] 2-12,14; | [XDI]US2017013724 (NOY AMIR [IL]) [XD] 1-3,7,8,13 * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0053] * [I] 4-6,9-12,14; | [A]WO2018020479 (LANDA LABS (2012) LTD [IL]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015128857 | US2017013724 | US9616524 | - LOSSEN et al., "Pattern Transfer Printing (PTPTM) for c-Si solar cell metallization, 5th Workshop on Metallization for Crystalline Silicon Solar Cells", Energy Procedia, (20150000), vol. 67, pages 156 - 162 | - Handbook of photovoltaic science and engineering, (20110000), pages 276 - 277 | CN20211134191 |