EP4364918 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHIPBOARD AND CHIPBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasch, Joachim, Prof. Dr. 10317 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Braun, Roger 6130 WILLISAU LU / CH | 03 /
Kalwa, Norbert, Dr. 32805 Horn - Bad Meinberg / DE | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22205767.1 | 07.11.2022 | [2024/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364918 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, B27N3/02, B27N3/18, B27N7/00, E04C2/16, // B27N3/20 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
B27N7/005 (EP);
B27N1/006 (EP);
B27N3/02 (EP);
B27N3/18 (EP);
B27N7/00 (EP);
B27N3/203 (EP);
E04C2/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SPANPLATTE SOWIE SPANPLATTE | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHIPBOARD AND CHIPBOARD | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE PARTICULES AINSI QUE PANNEAU DE PARTICULES | [2024/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3725481 (SWISS KRONO TEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] ** paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]EP3736095 (SWISS KRONO TEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0064] * |