EP4190734 - SPUN YARN TAKE-UP APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg. 2-6-26, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Takanori Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Shuhei Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | 03 /
MORINAGA, Ryo Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22205785.3 | 07.11.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | JP20210195991 | 02.12.2021 Original published format: JP 2021195991 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190734 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H57/00, B65H57/16 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B65H57/16 (EP);
D01D5/16 (CN);
B65H57/003 (EP);
D01D11/04 (CN);
D01D7/00 (CN);
B65H2701/3132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN VON GESPONNENEM GARN | [2023/23] | English: | SPUN YARN TAKE-UP APPARATUS | [2023/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE RATTRAPAGE DE FIL FILÉ | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 23.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2407407 (TMT MACHINERY INC [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,9-11 * figures 2A-8B *; | [AD]JP2015187324 (TMT MACHINERY INC) [AD] 1-3 * figures 1-8 *; | [XA]WO2018172077 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,11 * page 4, line 23 - page 8, line 14 * * page 10, line 28 - page 13, line 24; figures 1.1-3.2 * [A] 7,8,12,13; | [A]EP3666701 (TMT MACHINERY INC [JP]) [A] 1,4-6,9-11 * figures 2-8 *; | [A]DE102019000644 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6,9-11* figures 1.1 - 1.3 * | by applicant | JP2015187324 |