EP4180986 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LEARNING-BASED SYNTHESIS OF DATA TRANSFORMATION RULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | 01.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDICHERLA, Raveendra Kumar 560009 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
MITRA, Sayandeep 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
NAIK, Ravindra Dinkar 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 22206079.0 | 08.11.2022 | [2023/20] | Priority number, date | IN202121052118 | 13.11.2021 Original published format: IN202121052118 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180986 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/21 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G06F16/211 (EP);
G06F16/213 (US);
G06F16/214 (EP);
G06F40/284 (US);
G06F40/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR LERNBASIERTEN SYNTHESE VON DATENTRANSFORMATIONSREGELN | [2023/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LEARNING-BASED SYNTHESIS OF DATA TRANSFORMATION RULES | [2023/20] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE BASÉE SUR L'APPRENTISSAGE DE RÈGLES DE TRANSFORMATION DE DONNÉES | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 25.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - YUEPENG WANG ET AL, "Data Migration using Datalog Program Synthesis", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200303), XP081613413 [I] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1007, column r, line 12 - line 14 * * page 1016, column r, line 26 - line 39 * * figure 1 * | [T] - MITRA SAYANDEEP MITRA SAYANDEEP@TCS COM ET AL, "Learning-based assistant for data migration of enterprise information systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 36TH IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTOMATED SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, ACMPUB27, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20211115), doi:10.1109/ASE51524.2021.9678533, ISBN 978-1-4503-9442-0, pages 1121 - 1125, XP058907611 [T] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASE51524.2021.9678533 |