EP4180614 - GUIDE CHAIN FOR A FABRIC ROLLER BLIND AND FABRIC ROLLER BLIND COMPRISING SAID GUIDE CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palagina S.r.l. Via Palagina, 39 50054 Fucecchio (FI) / IT | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTUNI, Alessandro 50053 Empoli / IT | 02 /
ROSSI, Luca 56028 San Miniato (PI) / IT | 03 /
CIOLI, Enrico 50053 Empoli (FI) / IT | 04 /
MELANI, Marco 51100 Pistoia (PT) / IT | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Luca, et al Gallo & Partners S.r.l. Via Rezzonico, 6 35131 Padova / IT | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 22206767.0 | 10.11.2022 | [2023/20] | Priority number, date | IT20210028631 | 10.11.2021 Original published format: IT202100028631 | [2023/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180614 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/54, E06B9/58 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
E06B9/54 (EP);
E06B9/58 (EP);
E06B2009/543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSKETTE FÜR EIN STOFFROLLO UND STOFFROLLO MIT DIESER FÜHRUNGSKETTE | [2023/20] | English: | GUIDE CHAIN FOR A FABRIC ROLLER BLIND AND FABRIC ROLLER BLIND COMPRISING SAID GUIDE CHAIN | [2023/20] | French: | CHAÎNE DE GUIDAGE POUR UN STORE À ROULEAU EN TISSU ET STORE À ROULEAU EN TISSU COMPRENANT LADITE CHAÎNE DE GUIDAGE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]ITTV20090014 (BETTIO SERVICE SPA); | [A]EP3056650 (BETTIO SERVICE SPA [IT]); | [X]EP3517805 (AUTO MOTION SHADE INC [CA]) | by applicant | EP3517805 |