EP4166928 - PHOTOACOUSTIC GAS SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tumpold, David 85551 Kirchheim b. München / DE | 02 /
Glacer, Christoph 81827 München / DE | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Hersina, Günter, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 22206913.0 | 23.10.2018 | [2023/16] | Priority number, date | US201715791132 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US201715791132 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4166928 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G01N33/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/004 (EP,US);
G01N21/1702 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/2418 (US);
G01N21/01 (CN);
G01N2021/1704 (EP,US);
G01N2291/021 (US);
G01N2291/02809 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOTOAKUSTISCHES GASSENSORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2023/16] | English: | PHOTOACOUSTIC GAS SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTEUR DE GAZ PHOTOACOUSTIQUE | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18202100.6 / EP3483589 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6825471 (SHULGA ALEKSANDRE [DE], et al) [I] 1-12,15-17 * col. 1, lines 6-24; col. 2, lines 18-57; col. 4, lines 2-14; col. 5, line 11, to col. 6, line 36;;; figures 1,2,3,6-8 *; | [I]US2015211983 (SPECK ANDREW J [US], et al) [I] 1-12,15-17* paragraphs [0027] , [0033] - [0035] - [0064]; figures 5B, 7, 8A *; | [I] - Y SHEN ET AL, "Time Resolved Aspects of Pulsed Photoacoustic Spectroscopy", ANALYTICAL SCIENCES, (20010401), vol. 17, pages s221 - s222, XP055400796 [I] 1-12,15-17 * the whole document * |