EP4180029 - COMPOSITION FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF SKIN WELL-BEING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scherk GmbH Neue Jakobstr. 1 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henssen, Peter Berlin / DE | 02 /
Saguet, Thibaut Olivet / FR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Célanie 21, rue Henri Rochefort 75017 Paris / FR | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 22207160.7 | 14.11.2022 | [2023/20] | Priority number, date | FR20210012027 | 15.11.2021 Original published format: FR 2112027 | [2023/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180029 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4180029 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61K8/9706, A61K8/9789, A61Q19/00 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
A61K8/9706 (EP);
A61K8/645 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES WOHLBEFINDENS DER HAUT | [2023/20] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF SKIN WELL-BEING | [2023/20] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'AMÉLIORATION DU BIEN-ÊTRE CUTANÉE | [2023/20] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 19.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2829694 (JACQUES ANDHREL [FR]) [AD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A] - anonymous, "Crème Originelle Preventative Anti-Ageing Skincare Dry Skin", GNPD, MINTEL, (20160801), Database accession no. 4174595, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/4174595/, XP055937665 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - anonymous, "Melon & Fruit Children Delicate Moisture Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (20120702), Database accession no. 1825043, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/1825043/, XP055937667 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1011782 | WO03017966 | FR2829694 | JP2015086187 | JP2015086189 | CN105852128 | TW201713353 |