EP4318278 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING RUNOFF ABNORMAL ABRUPT-CHANGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Three Gorges Co., Ltd. No. 1 Liuhe Road Jiang'an District Wuhan Hubei 430010 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Mengjie Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 02 /
LIANG, Lili Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 03 /
MOU, Hailei Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 04 /
YIN, Zhaokai Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Hongbing Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Zhiwu Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 07 /
WU, Di Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Kun Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 09 /
LU, Bei Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 10 /
WANG, Pengxiang Wuhan, 430010 / CN | 11 /
GUO, Ze'ang Wuhan, 430010 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22207243.1 | 14.11.2022 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | CN202210919272 | 02.08.2022 Original published format: CN202210919272 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318278 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/18 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP);
G06F16/215 (CN);
G06F16/2465 (CN);
G06F16/29 (CN);
Y02A10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON ABLAUFANOMALIEN ABRUPTEN ÄNDERUNGENSDATEN | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING RUNOFF ABNORMAL ABRUPT-CHANGE DATA | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES À CHANGEMENT BRUSQUE ANORMAL D'EXÉCUTION | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 06.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106708694 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [I]CN112286924 (CHINA INST WATER RESOURCES & HYDROPOWER RES) [I] 1-4 * Steps S1-S7 *; | [I]CN113780657 (CHINA THREE GORGES CORP, et al) [I] 1-4 * Steps S101-S1034 *; | [A] - AOQIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Time series data cleaning", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VLDB ENDOWMENT; [ACM DIGITAL LIBRARY], ASSOC. OF COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, NY, (20170601), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 2150-8097, pages 1046 - 1057, XP058372447 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |