EP4187264 - ELECTROSTATIC CHARGE SENSOR WITH HIGH IMPEDANCE CONTACT PADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORIO, Massimo 20126 Milano / IT | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22207467.6 | 15.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | US202117537069 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: US202117537069 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187264 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R29/24 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G01R29/24 (EP,CN,US);
G01R29/12 (EP,CN,US);
G01R29/0878 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER LADUNGSSENSOR MIT KONTAKTFLÄCHEN MIT HOHER IMPEDANZ | [2023/22] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC CHARGE SENSOR WITH HIGH IMPEDANCE CONTACT PADS | [2023/22] | French: | CAPTEUR DE CHARGE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE À PLOTS DE CONTACT À HAUTE IMPÉDANCE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 28.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6900642 (ZANK PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 7-15; figures 1-17; claims 1-8D *; | [A]US2012306013 (DONOVAN COLM [ES], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0074]; figures 1A-7C; claims 1-21 *; | [A]US8624663 (GAGNE NICKOLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* columns 2-18; figures 1-8B; claims 1-21 * |